CA SB866 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.241 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.191 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB866 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 866 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB866 Hernandez (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 866 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB866 Hernandez (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-09 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2452.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 3045.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-23 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1265.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1123.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 676.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-03-23 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-02-19 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.241 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |