CA SB862 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 449, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 449, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2018 (Chapters 29 and 30 of the Statutes of 2018) by amending Items 0250-001-0932, 0250-101-0932, 0509-001-0001, 0540-001-6076, 0650-001-0001, 0690-101-0001, 0820-001-0001, 0890-101-0001, 2740-001-0044, 3340-001-0318, 3540-001-0140, 3760-101-3228, 3940-001-0001, 3940-101-0001, 5180-101-0001, 5180-151-0001, 6100-001-0890, 6100-119-0890, 6100-134-0890, 6100-136-0890, 6100-137-0890, 6100-194-0890, 6100-197-0890, 6100-295-0001, 6100-485, 6100-488, 6120-011-0001, 6440-001-0001, 6870-295-0001, 8570-001-0001, and 8660-101-0493 of, and adding Items 3760-490, 3900-011-3119, 3940-002-0001, 6120-140-0001, 6120-141-0001, and 8660-495 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB862 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB862 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB862 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 862 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 62 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB862 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB862 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB862 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 862 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 62 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB862 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 449, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 6040.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6046.) |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 6040.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 18. Page 6780.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6705.) |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6286.) |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4926.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |