CA SB861 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10490 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: contract eligibility: conflict
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB861 Corbett Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 861 Corbett Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB861 Corbett (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 861 Corbett Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB861 Corbett (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-09 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2449.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 11. Page 3039.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2710.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |
2011-06-20 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and J., E.D. & E. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1123.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 618.) (April 12). | |
2011-04-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10490 | New Code | See Bill Text |