CA SB857 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 12301.24 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-home supportive services: provider orientation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Assembly - SB 857 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB857 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB857 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-03SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-07-02SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 5005.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 6054.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-07-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6049.)
2018-07-02AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-07-02AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-07-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6049.)
2018-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4924.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12301.24New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback