CA SB856 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2018 by amending Items 0515-101-0001, 0521-101-0001, 0540-101-0001, 0540-101-6088, 0650-001-3228, 2660-102-0890, 2660-302-0890, 2740-001-0044, 2740-491, 3340-001-0318, 3340-001-3228, 3360-001-3117, 3540-002-3228, 3640-102-6088, 3640-103-6088, 3760-101-6088, 3790-101-0001, 3810-101-6088, 3860-101-6083, 3860-301-6088, 3900-001-3228, 3900-101-0115, 3930-001-0106, 3940-101-0001, 3970-001-8020, 4140-101-3085, 4260-101-0890, 4260-101-3305, 4440-490, 5180-001-0001, 5180-101-0001, 5180-111-0001, 5180-141-0001, 5227-107-0001, 6100-194-0001, 6610-001-0001, 6870-201-0001, 6870-491, 6980-101-0001, 7120-101-0001, 8570-101-0001, 8955-001-0001, and 8955-101-0001 of, and adding Items 0540-101-3228, 0650-101-3228, 0690-001-3228, 3360-001-3228, 3360-101-3228, 3540-001-3228, 3540-003-3228, 3600-101-3228, 3720-101-3228, 3760-101-3228, 3820-101-3228, 3850-101-6029, 3900-101-0226, 3900-101-3228, 3900-102-3228, 3970-101-3228, 4260-102-3305, 4260-495, 4700-001-3228, 4700-101-3228, 5180-495, 8570-101-3228, and 8660-493 to, Section 2.00 of, amending Section 39.00 of, and adding Section 15.14 to, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Assembly - SB 856 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB856 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB856 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB856 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB856 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 4867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 5960.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 5957.) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 5957.) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4924.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |