CA SB852 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19829.9846 and 19829.9847 of the Government Code, relating to state public employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State public employment: memorandum of understanding: State Bargaining Unit 6: approval.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - SB 852 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB852 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB852 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-06-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-14SenateUnanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file.
2018-06-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 5. Page 5809.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 5802.)
2018-06-14AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 5802.)
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4922.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code19829.9846Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19829.9847Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback