CA SB851 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 379.10 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-generation incentive program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2023-05-18SenateMay 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2023-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2023-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 872.) (April 24).
2023-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2023-03-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2023-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2023-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code379.10Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback