CA SB843 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-30 - Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6685.) Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-30 - Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6685.) Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25019 of the Corporations Code, and to amend Sections 216 and 218 of, to add Chapter 7.6 (commencing with Section 2832) to Part 2 of Division 1 of, and to repeal Section 2826.5 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: electrical corporations: City of Davis PVUSA
Sponsors
Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-08-24 - Assembly - SB 843 Wolk Senate Third Reading By GATTO Amend By GATTO Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB843 Wolk (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-08-24 - Assembly - SB 843 Wolk Senate Third Reading By GATTO Amend By GATTO Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB843 Wolk (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6685.) Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6256.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-08-06 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. | |
2012-08-06 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5751.) | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 25). | |
2012-05-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-07-05 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-06-23 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2011-04-28 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-04-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 645.) (April 12). | |
2011-04-05 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2011-03-25 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing April 28. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 25019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2826.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2832 | New Code | See Bill Text |