CA SB840 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, relating to the state budget, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - SB 840 Mitchell Conference Report By TING (Y: 57 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Conference Report SB840 Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB840 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - SB 840 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB840 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Conference Report SB840 Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB840 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - SB 840 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB840 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to enrgrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Assembly adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 57. Noes 23. Page 5820.) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4688.) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-06-10 | Senate | To print. |
2018-06-10 | Senate | From Conference Committee: Be adopted. Ayes 6: Senators Mitchell, Skinner, and Roth, Assembly Members Ting, Arambula, and Bloom. Noes 4: Senators Nielsen and Moorlach, Assembly Members Obernolte and Kiley. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | (Assembly Member Chávez replaced by Assembly Member Kiley for this hearing) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Set for hearing June 8. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Assembly Members Ting (Chair), Arambula, Bloom, Chávez, and Obernolte appointed to Conference Committee. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senators Mitchell (Chair), Roth, Skinner, Moorlach, and Nielsen appointed to Conference Committee. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5298.) |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29 suspended in Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4262.) |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29 suspended in Senate. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to Conference Committee. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 0. Noes 35. Page 4261.) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5096.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4918.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |