CA SB834 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 23703.6 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax-exempt status: insurrection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB834 Wiener et al (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2022-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2022-05-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-05-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 19).
2022-05-13SenateSet for hearing May 19.
2022-05-09SenateMay 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2022-05-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-04-29SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2022-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3459.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2022-04-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2022-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2022-04-13SenateApril 21 hearing postponed by committee.
2022-04-08SenateSet for hearing April 26 in PUB. S. pending receipt.
2022-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2022-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2022-03-17SenateRe-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S.
2022-03-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2022-01-19SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2022-01-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
2022-01-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23703.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback