CA SB83 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2572, 2576, 8208, 8235, 8263, 8263.1, 8265, 8273.1, 8357, 11800, 17224, 17592.71, 33050, 37202, 40090, 41203.1, 41203.5, 46160, 47607.3, 47614.5, 47635, 47662, 48301, 48302, 48306, 48307, 48308, 48310, 48311, 48312, 48313, 48314, 48315, 48316 49430.5, 49533, 52052, 52064, 52066, 52070, 52070.5, 52074, 52075, 53310, 53311, 53313, 56305, 56836.165, and 60643 of, to amend and repeal Section 17080 of, to add Sections 2575.1, 8227.6, 8262.2, 41024, 41207.43, 41207.44, 48317, 56836.29, and 60213 to, to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 52200) to Chapter 7 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Sections 2558.2, 17078.73, 53312, 60209, and 60211 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 17581.6 of, and to add Section 17581.96 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1596.64 and 1596.792 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 26233 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 11323.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 52 of Chapter 13 of the Statutes of 2015, relating to school finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
School finance: education omnibus trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB83 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 2161.) |
2017-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |