CA SB83 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2011 (Chapter 33 of the Statutes of 2011) by amending Item 0911-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the support of state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, Budget Bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2011: Citizens Redistricting Commission.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB83 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Assembly - SB 83 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB83 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-29 - Assembly - SB 83 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB83 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-04-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2012-04-12 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 3127.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-03-29 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-03-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 19. Page 4185.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-03-28 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (March 27). | |
2012-03-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-03-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-02-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-02-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 168.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-02-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |