CA SB823 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 337, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 12803 of, to repeal Article 1 (commencing with Section 12820) of Chapter 1 of Part 2.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to repeal and add Sections 12838 and 12838.1 of, the Government Code, to add Section 13015 to, to repeal Section 830.5 of, and to repeal and add Sections 830.5 and 2816 to, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 207.1, 207.2, 209, 210.2, 707.1, and 912 of, to add Sections 733.1, 736.5, and 1955.2 to, to amend and repeal Section 731 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 607 and 730 of, to add Section 736.5 to, to add Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 1990) to Division 2.5 of, to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 2200) to, to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 2260) to Division 2.5 of, to add and repeal Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 2250) of Division 2.5 of, to repeal Sections 207.6, 2201, and 2202 of, and to repeal and add Sections 208.5, 1703, 1710, 1711, 1712, 1714, 1731.5, 1752.2, and 1762 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile justice realignment: Office of Youth and Community Restoration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 823 Budget and Fiscal Review Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB823 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB823 B. & F.R (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 337, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 13.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-31AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended.
2020-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-08-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-18SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3739.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-03-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-03-09SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.)
2020-01-22SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-01-13SenateRead first time.
2020-01-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback