CA SB822 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Joint Rule 61(b)(13,14,15,16) suspended.
Hearing: Aug 22 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 437
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 15 (commencing with Section 3100) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communications: broadband Internet access service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB822 Wiener et al (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 61(b)(13,14,15,16) suspended.
2018-08-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-08-09AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 20).
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4386.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4297.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4813.) (April 24).
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 4717.) (April 17).
2018-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-03-21SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
2018-03-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1775New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code3100New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code3020New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code272New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5840Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5905New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code8367New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback