CA SB821 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 615, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 615, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8593.4 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency notification: county jurisdictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 821 Jackson Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB821 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB821 Jackson et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB821 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB821 Jackson et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 615, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6152.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4835.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4784.) (April 24). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8585 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8593.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10850.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |