CA SB821 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 635, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 635, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 35740) to Chapter 4 of Part 21 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school district reorganization.
Title
School district reorganization: fiscal actions affecting
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB821 Fuller Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 821 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB821 Fuller (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 821 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB821 Fuller (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 635, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2157.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2597.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-06-30 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2011-05-27 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-05-19 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 949.) (May 11). | |
2011-04-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-27 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2011-04-13 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-04-04 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-29 | Set for hearing April 6. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-19 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35740 | New Code | See Bill Text |