CA SB820 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 953, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1001 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Settlement agreements: confidentiality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB820 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 820 Leyva Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB820 Leyva et al (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 953, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 5688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 6471.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 3).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4212.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4915.) (May 1).
2018-04-10SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1001New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback