CA SB820 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25395.109 and 25395.110 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials.
Title
Hazardous materials: California Land Reuse and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 820 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB820 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB820 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5718.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3847.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3810.) (May 9). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3610.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3418.) (April 6). |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25395.109 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25395.110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |