CA SB82 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5892 of, and to add Part 3.8 (commencing with Section 5848.5) to Division 5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Investment in Mental Health Wellness Act of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 82 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 59 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB82 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB82 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB82 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB82 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1374.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 1983.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 20. Page 1988.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 894.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5848.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5892 | Amended Code | Citation Text |