CA SB815 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 699.5, 721, 951, 952, 970, 971, 981.2, 981.3, 1012.2, 1025, and 1026 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Steve Knight [R] |
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB815 Committee on V.A. (Hueso) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - SB 815 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB815 Committee on V.A. (Correa) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - SB 815 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB815 Committee on V.A. (Correa) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1892.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2485.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 712.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 488.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 4. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1012.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 699.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 721 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 952 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 970 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 971 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 981.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 981.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |