CA SB814 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 231, 407.5, 467.5, 9250.14, 24252, 25351, 26103, 27900, 29004, 34505.1, and 34505.7 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-19 - Assembly - SB 814 TRANS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB814 TRANS (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB814 TRANS (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2439.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-06-25 | Assembly | June 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1094.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 943.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | From printer. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 231 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 24252 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 25351 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 26103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 29004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 34505.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 34505.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 407.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 467.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9250.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |