CA SB802 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 9.3 (commencing with Section 42000) to Chapter 3 of Part 4 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 8385 of, and to add Section 8386.7 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.
Title
Emergency backup generators: health facilities: permit operating condition exclusion.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and E., U. & C. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 42000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8386.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB802 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB802 |