CA SB802 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 41030, 41032, and 42010 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Emergency telephone user surcharge.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB802 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | June 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | June 8 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and REV. & TAX. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 24. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 42010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |