CA SB80 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 757, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 757, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5523, 8276.4, 8276.5, 8279.1, 8280.3, and 8283 of, and to add Sections 7711 and 8285 to, the Fish and Game Code, and to add Article 15 (commencing with Section 111224) to Chapter 5 of Part 5 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to commercial fishing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Commercial fishing: inspection: crab traps.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 80 McGuire Senate Second Reading By Stone (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB80 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB80 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB80 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB80 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 757, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2626.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3127.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 9). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1342.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 794.) (April 14). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 519.) (March 16). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 16. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and HEALTH. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 5523 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 7711 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8276.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8276.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8279.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8280.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8285 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 111224 | New Code | See Bill Text |