CA SB80 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8350 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 7911.1, 8632.5, 17208, 17306, and 17706 of, and to add Section 17306.1 to, the Family Code, to amend Sections 1522, 1596.66, 1596.67, 1596.871, 1597.09, and 1597.55a of, to add Section 1596.671 to, and to add Chapter 11.7 (commencing with Section 50807) to Part 2 of Division 31 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 11166 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 224.1, 4094.2, 4096.1, 4096.55, 9712.5, 11004, 11253, 11253.2, 11253.4, 11323.4, 11330.6, 11374, 11390, 11402.01, 11460, 11461.36, 11462.001, 11462.015, 11462.021, 11462.04, 11463, 11466, 11466.01, 11467, 11469, 12301.61, 12304.4, 12306.1, 12306.17, 13277, 13278, 13279, 13280, 13282, 13283, 14182.17, 15204.2, 15204.35, 15525, 16519.5, 16523, 16523.1, 17600.15, 17605, 17605.07, 17605.10, 17606.10, 17606.20, 18236, 18900.5, 18900.6, 18900.7, 18901.8, 18999, 18999.1, 18999.2, 18999.4, and 18999.6 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 13275) of Part 3 of Division 9 of, to amend and add Section 12306.16 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 11155, 11257, 11265.3, 11265.47, 11323.3, 11450, 11451.5, 18941, and 18995 of, to add Sections 9121, 10823.3, 11450.023, 11523.1, 13284, 13285, 16521.8, 17602.05, and 18900.8 to, to add Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 10835) to Part 2 of Division 9 of, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 16523.5) to Chapter 5 of Part 4 of Division 9 of, to add Chapter 5.4 (commencing with Section 16526) to Part 4 of Division 9 of, to add and repeal Section 11523.2 of, to add and repeal Chapter 5.7 (commencing with Section 13400) of Part 3 of Division 9 of, to repeal Sections 4359, 10507, 10790, 10791, 10822, 11155.1, 11265.5, 11465.5, 13281, and 17600.70 of, to repeal and add Sections 11323.2, 13275, and 13276 of, and to repeal, add, and repeal Chapter 4.6 (commencing with Section 10831) of Part 2 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, to amend Section 81 of Chapter 15 of the Statutes of 2017, to repeal Section 1 of Chapter 452 of the Statutes of 1996, and to repeal Section 1 of Chapter 561 of the Statutes of 1997, relating to human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Human services omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - SB 80 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB80 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB80 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB80 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB80 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1675.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 7. Page 2368.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 13. Page 2361.) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 665.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |