CA SB80 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21092.2, 21092.3, 21108, and 21152 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: notices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB80 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 80 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB80 Wieckowski (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 80 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB80 Wieckowski (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-15 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-15 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2689.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 3033.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (July 19). |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 800.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 708.) (April 17). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 536.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21092.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21092.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |