CA SB80 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19136 and 19167 of, and to add Section 17052 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Personal income taxes: earned income credit.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-19 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB80 Committee on Budget an d Fiscal ReviewBy Leno (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - SB 80 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB80 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - SB 80 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB80 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-06-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1514.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 2060.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 379.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to second reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time. |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19136 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |