CA SB80 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-13 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-13 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17600.10, 17600.15, 17600.20, 17601.25, 17603, 17604, and 17606.10, to amend, repeal, and add Section 17600 of, to add Sections 11450.025, 14301.5 17600.50, 17600.60, 17601.50, 17601.75, and 17609.02 to, to add a heading to Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 17601.25) of Chapter 6 of Part 5 of Division 9 of, and to add Article 6.6 (commencing with Section 14199.1) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, and Article 11 (commencing with Section 17610), Article 12 (commencing with Section 17612.1), and Article 13 (commencing with Section 17613.1) to Chapter 6 of Part 5 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health and human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Health and human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB80 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 894.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17600.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17600.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17600.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17601.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17606.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |