CA SB80 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5134 of the Business and Professions Code, to repeal and add Section 14044 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 965, 16142, 16142.1, 16148, 16320, 51244, and 63048.66 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 12716 of, to add Section 22850.5 to, to add and repeal Section 8670.48.3 of, and to repeal Section 51244.3 of, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 4003 and 4004 of, and to add Section 14004.5 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to state government, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - F#37 SB80 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Assembly - SB 80 B.& F. R. Third Reading Urgency By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB80 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Assembly - SB 80 B.& F. R. Third Reading Urgency By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB80 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file. | |
2011-03-24 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending. | |
2011-03-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-03-24 | Approved by the Governor with item veto. | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 8:50 p.m. | |
2011-03-16 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 355.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-03-16 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 582.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-03-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-02-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-02-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 167.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-02-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 14044 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12716 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16142 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16142.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16148 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51244 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63048.66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 965 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 14004.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 4004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14004.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 4004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |