CA SB8 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65589.5, 65905.5, 65913.10, 65940, 65941.1, 65943, 65950, 66300, and 66301 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 654 of the Statutes of 2019, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Crisis Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB8 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 8 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Daly (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB8 Skinner et al (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-16 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-01SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 3.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-26AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2021-08-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2021-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 30).
2021-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-06-01AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-05-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 1228.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 986.) (April 29).
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2021-03-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 632.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-03-19SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2021-03-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback