CA SB799 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 520, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 520, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 801, 2701, 2708, 2770.7, 2811.5, and 2814 of, to add Section 2761.5 to, and to repeal Section 2718 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Nursing.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB799 Hill Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 799 Hill Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB799 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 799 Hill Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB799 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 520, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2835.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3039.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(a)(10) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2747.) |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1338.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 826.) (April 24). |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2708 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2718 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2761.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2770.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2811.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2814 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |