CA SB798 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 775, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 775, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 115.6, 144, 146, 328, 651, 656, 683, 800, 803.1, 805, 805.01, 805.1, 805.5, 805.6, 810, 2001, 2008, 2020, 2054, 2082, 2087, 2111, 2112, 2143, 2168.4, 2191, 2216.3, 2220.05, 2221, 2232, 2334, 2415, 2421, 2423, 2435, 2435.2, 2445, 2450, 2454.5, 2460, 2461, 2472, 2475, 2479, 2486, 2488, 2492, 2499, 2525.2, 2529, 4170, and 4175 of, to amend and repeal Sections 2066, 2067, 2072, 2073, 2085, 2089, 2089.5, 2089.7, 2090, 2091, 2091.1, 2091.2, 2100, 2102, 2103, 2104, 2104.5, 2107, 2115, 2135.7, 2529.1, 2529.5, and 2529.6 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 2064, 2065, 2084, 2084.5, 2096, 2105, 2113, 2135, and 2135.5 of, to add Sections 2026, 2064.5, 2064.7, 2064.8, 2499.7, and 2566.2 to, to repeal Sections 2052.5, 2420, and 2422 of, and to repeal the heading of Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 2529) of Division 2 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 43.7 and 43.8 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 13401 and 13401.5 of the Corporations Code, to amend Section 1157 of the Evidence Code, to amend Section 11529 of, and to amend and repeal Section 12529.6 of, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 11362.7 and 128335 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts: boards.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB798 Hill Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 798 Hill Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB798 Hill (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 798 Hill Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB798 Hill (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 775, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2860.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 3221.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (September 1). |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(a)(10) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2747.) |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | July 11 set for first hearing.Testimony taken. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1337.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 826.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |