CA SB798 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 53071.5 of the Government Code, relating to imitation firearms.
Title
Imitation firearms: regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB798 De León (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB798 De León (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | From Assembly without further action. | |
2011-09-06 | Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2011-09-06 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) | |
2011-08-18 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2446.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-21 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-06-14 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-09 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 8991.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-04-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 742.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-05 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53071.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 19920 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 20153 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |