CA SB793 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 32132.95 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 20155 and 20155.1 of the Public Contract Code, and to add and repeal Sections 5580 and 35160 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Competitive bidding: design-build and best value construction contracting.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB793 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 793 Hill Senate Third Reading By BERMAN (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB793 Hill et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 793 Hill Senate Third Reading By BERMAN (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB793 Hill et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3017.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 3491.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (September 12). |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 954.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 745.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 32132.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 32132.95 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20155.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 35160 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5580 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |