CA SB792 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 807, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 807, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1597.055 and 1597.54 of, and to add Sections 1596.7995 and 1597.622 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to day care facilities.
Title
Day care facilities: immunizations: exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB792 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 792 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Assembly - SB 792 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By THURMOND Amend By MATHIS Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By HOLDEN (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB792 Mendoza (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 792 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Assembly - SB 792 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By THURMOND Amend By MATHIS Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By HOLDEN (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB792 Mendoza (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 807, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2670.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 2951.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Amendments by Assembly Member Mathis tabled on motion by Assembly Member Holden. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 2888.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 26). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 14). |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (June 30). |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUM. S. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1069.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 817.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 651.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1596.7995 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.800 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1597.055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1597.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1597.622 | New Code | See Bill Text |