CA SB790 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 599, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 599, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 331.1, 365.1, 366.2, 380, 381.1, and 395.5 of, to add Sections 396.5 and 707 to, and to add Part 5 (commencing with Section 3260) to Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: community choice aggregation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB790 Leno Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 790 Leno Senate Third Reading By NESTANDE (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB790 Leno (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 790 Leno Senate Third Reading By NESTANDE (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB790 Leno (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 599, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-09 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2451.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 3045.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-27 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1122.) (May 26). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 858.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-28 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-03-16 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 331.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 365.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 366.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 381.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 395.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 396.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 707 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |