CA SB787 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1255.23 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospitals, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals: closures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-13 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2016-01-13SenateJanuary 13 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 2901.)
2016-01-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2016-01-05SenateSet for hearing January 13.
2015-04-30SenateApril 29 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
2015-04-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2015-03-19SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-03-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
2015-02-27SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1255.23New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback