CA SB787 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 13.6 (commencing with Section 21200) to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: the Sustainable Environmental
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Bill Emmerson [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Steve Knight [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Mimi Walters [R] |
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] | Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 7. Page 790.) Reconsideration granted. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21200 | New Code | See Bill Text |