CA SB786 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 425.16 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil procedure.
Title
Civil procedure: attorney's fees and costs.
Sponsors
Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-07-13 - Assembly - SB 786 Yee Senate Third Reading By EVANS (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB786 Yee (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB786 Yee (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-07-27 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-07-13 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-07-13 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 2479.) To Senate. | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-05-28 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1038.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 875.) | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 12. | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |