CA SB783 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 31465, 31627.1, 31627.2, and 31631.5 of the Government Code, relating to retirement.
Title
County Employees Retirement Law of 1937.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB783 L., P.E. & R. (Hill) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 923.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 7. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31465 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31627.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31627.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31631.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |