CA SB776 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 5506.) Ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1045 of the Evidence Code, and to amend Sections 832.5, 832.7, and 832.12 of, and to add Section 832.13 to, the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officers: release of records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 776 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Kamlager (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB776 Skinner (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 5506.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5408.)
2020-08-30SenateJoint Rule 61(b)(17) suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 5275.)
2020-09-01SenateOrdered to inactive file.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 15.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(d) suspended.
2020-08-30AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-30AssemblyJoint Rule 61(b)(17) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 14.)
2020-08-25AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (August 20).
2020-08-18AssemblyAugust 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-08-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 5).
2020-07-27AssemblyAugust 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-01-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-01-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 3150.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-01-16SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2020-01-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3098.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-07SenateSet for hearing January 15.
2020-01-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Evidence Code1045Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code832.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback