CA SB776 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 647 of the Penal Code, relating to disorderly conduct.
Title
Disorderly conduct: prostitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Subject matter be referred (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB776 Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB776 Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | June 30 hearing: Held in committee for interim study. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 984.) (May 12). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |