CA SB775 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1947.8 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Tenancy: rent control: certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB775 Allen Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - SB 775 Allen Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB775 Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - SB 775 Allen Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB775 Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4637.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5515.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | July 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 984.) (May 12). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1947.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |