CA SB774 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 42127.01 of the Education Code, relating to school finance.
Title
School finance: school districts: annual budgets: reserve balance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | April 29 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42127.01 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_774&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0751-0800/sb_774_bill_20150227_introduced.html |