CA SB772 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 142.4 of the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety and health.
Title
Occupational safety and health: regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB772 Leyva (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB772 Leyva (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 19). |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1069.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 854.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14838.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 142.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |