CA SB772 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19161.4 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to home furnishings.
Title
Home furnishings: fire retardancy: juvenile products.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB772 Leno (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB772 Leno (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-08-19 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-07-14 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-22 | Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and B. & P. | |
2009-06-18 | To Coms. on B. & P. and E.S. & T.M. | |
2009-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1200.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 948.) | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 676.) | |
2009-04-13 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |