CA SB769 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 78041, 78042, and 78043 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Baccalaureate Degree Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB769 Hill et al (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB769 Hill et al (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 1335.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1190.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 849.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 78041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 78042 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 78043 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |