CA SB764 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.6 (commencing with Section 11090) to Chapter 1 of Title 1 of Part 4 of, and to add and repeal Section 11091 of, the Penal Code, relating to domestic terrorism.
Title
Domestic terrorism.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | April 27 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11090 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 11091 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |