CA SB763 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 640, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 640, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25284.1, 25299.51, 25299.102, 25299.103, 25299.104, 25299.105, 25299.106, 25299.107, 25299.109, and 25299.117 of, to repeal Section 25299.113 of, and to repeal and add Section 25299.110 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to underground storage tanks, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
State Water Resources Control Board: underground storage tanks.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 763 Fuller Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB763 Fuller Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB763 Fuller (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB763 Fuller Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB763 Fuller (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 640, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2440.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3315.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3319.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 2974.) Read third time and amended. (Page 2975.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1108.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 790.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25284.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.111 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.113 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.117 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.50.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 41700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |