CA SB762 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10187.5 and 22161 of, and to add and repeal Article 3.7 (commencing with Section 20155) of Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Competitive bidding: best value: pilot program: design-build.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB762 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 762 Wolk Senate Third Reading By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB762 Wolk (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 762 Wolk Senate Third Reading By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB762 Wolk (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2674.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2973.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 19). |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 15). |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 1019.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 22). |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10187.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20155 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 22161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |